LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Iowa IA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HF537
Action History
IA
Iowa House Bill HF537
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Iowa 2023-2024 Regular Session
Iowa House Bill HF537
Action History
House
02/05/2024
Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2317.
House
01/30/2024
Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 161.
House
01/23/2024
Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
House
01/22/2024
Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2024 2:00PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber.
House
01/17/2024
Subcommittee: Fry, Boden and Brown-Powers. H.J. 102.
House
03/01/2023
Introduced, referred to Health and Human Services. H.J. 454.