House | 02/20/2024 | Withdrawn. H.J. 335. | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2136. | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 124. | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0. | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/16/2024 9:45AM House Lounge. | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Subcommittee: Thompson, P., Nordman and Srinivas. H.J. 48. | ||
House | 12/31/2023 | END OF [] ACTIONS | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Rereferred to Judiciary. H.J. 1029. | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 477. |