LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Iowa IA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HF554
Action History
IA
Iowa House Bill HF554
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Iowa 2023-2024 Regular Session
Iowa House Bill HF554
Action History
House
02/01/2024
Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1.
House
01/31/2024
Subcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2024 1:30PM House Lounge.
House
01/16/2024
Subcommittee: Wood, Gerhold and Wilson. H.J. 93.
House
05/04/2023
Rereferred to Economic Growth and Technology. H.J. 1029.
House
03/02/2023
Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 477.