House
|
04/19/2024
|
Signed by Governor. H.J. 926.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 925.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Message from House. S.J. 745.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 738.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Immediate message. H.J. 730.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Passed House, yeas 87, nays 9. H.J. 724.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
House concurred in Senate amendment H-8060. H.J. 724.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Amendment H-8202 to Senate amendment H-8060 withdrawn. H.J. 724.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 587.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Amendment H-8202 filed. H.J. 586.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Senate amendment H-8060 filed. H.J. 400.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 385.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Immediate message. S.J. 380.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Passed Senate, yeas 46, nays 0. S.J. 377.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Amendment S-3112 adopted, as amended. S.J. 377.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Amendment S-5002 adopted. S.J. 377.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Amendment S-5002 to S-3112 filed. S.J. 219.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 746.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Amendment S-3112 filed. S.J. 726.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 726.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Subcommittee Meeting: 03/23/2023 1:00PM Room 217 Conference Room.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Subcommittee: Edler, Costello, and Trone Garriott. S.J. 645.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Read first time, referred to Health and Human Services. S.J. 631.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Message from House. S.J. 631.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Immediate message. H.J. 673.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Passed House, yeas 86, nays 10. H.J. 672.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 477.
|
|
|