Senate | 03/21/2023 | Subcommittee: Rowley, Costello, and Trone Garriott. S.J. 645. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Read first time, referred to Health and Human Services. S.J. 631. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Message from House. S.J. 631. | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Immediate message. H.J. 673. | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Passed House, yeas 61, nays 35. H.J. 662. | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Amendment H-1120, yeas 34, nays 62, lost. H.J. 566. | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Amendment H-1116 adopted. H.J. 661. | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Amendments H-1116 and H-1120 filed. H.J. 654. | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 479. |