House | 05/03/2023 | Signed by Governor. H.J. 05/03. | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1014. | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Message from Senate. H.J. 890. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Immediate message. S.J. 882. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Passed Senate, yeas 50, nays 0. S.J. 878. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Substituted for SF 286. S.J. 877. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 721. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Read first time, attached to SF 286. S.J. 552. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Message from House. S.J. 552. | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Immediate message. H.J. 596. | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Passed House, yeas 96, nays 0. H.J. 577. | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Amendment H-1042 adopted. H.J. 576. | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Committee amendment H-1042 filed. H.J. 499. | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 479. |