House | 04/13/2023 | Withdrawn. H.J. 860. | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 700. | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 777. | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/15/2023 8:00AM House Lounge 2. | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Subcommittee: Mommsen, Graber, Latham, Scheetz and Zabner. H.J. 597. | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Introduced, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 482. |