House | 02/29/2024 | Withdrawn. H.J. 481. | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2568. | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 286. | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2024 12:00PM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Subcommittee: Gerhold, Kressig and Sorensen. H.J. 131. | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Rereferred to Transportation. H.J. 1029. | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 482. |