Senate | 06/05/2023 | Referred to Education. S.J. 1092. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 722. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Read first time, attached to SF 483. S.J. 573. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Message from House. S.J. 573. | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Explanation of vote. H.J. 653. | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Immediate message. H.J. 620. | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Passed House, yeas 96, nays 1. H.J. 605. | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 493. |