House | 03/20/2024 | Withdrawn. H.J. 633. | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2519. | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 234. | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2024 12:00PM RM 304.1. | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Subcommittee: Lohse, Jones and Scheetz. H.J. 49. | ||
House | 12/31/2023 | END OF [] ACTIONS | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Rereferred to Judiciary. H.J. 1030. | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Amendments H-1235, H-1236 and H-1237 filed. H.J. 827. | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Amendments H-1214 and H-1234 filed. H.J. 826. | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Amendment H-1204 filed. H.J. 806. | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 776. | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 494. |