Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 1092.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 1037.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Read first time, attached to SF 543. S.J. 776.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Message from House. S.J. 776.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Immediate message. H.J. 824.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Passed House, yeas 62, nays 37. H.J. 812.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Amendment H-1206 adopted, as amended. H.J. 812.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 812.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Motion to suspend rules for immediate consideration of amendment H-1244 to amendment H-1206, yeas 34, nays 64. H.J. 811.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Point of order raised on amendment H-1244 to amendment H-1206, ruled not germane. H.J. 811.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Amendment H-1244 filed. H.J. 811.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 825.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 810.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Motion to suspend rules for immediate consideration of amendment H-1243 to amendment H-1206, yeas 36, nays 63. H.J. 810.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Point of order raised on amendment H-1243 to amendment H-1206, ruled not germane. H.J. 809.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Amendment H-1243 filed. H.J. 809.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Amendment H-1213 to amendment H-1206, filed, adopted. H.J. 809.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Amendment H-1242 to amendment H-1206, filed, adopted. H.J. 809.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Amendment H-1208 to amendment H-1206, filed, withdrawn. H.J. 809.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 809.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Motion to suspend rules for immediate consideration of amendment H-1162, yeas 35, nays 64. H.J. 808.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Point of order raised on amendment H-1162, ruled not germane. H.J. 808.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Amendment H-1206 filed. H.J. 806.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 746.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Fiscal note.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Amendment H-1162 filed. H.J. 736.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 514.
|
|
|