House
|
06/01/2023
|
Signed by Governor. H.J. 1042.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1038.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 919.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Immediate message. S.J. 998.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 997.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Substituted for SF 544. S.J. 997.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 747.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Read first time, attached to SF 544. S.J. 741.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Message from House. S.J. 741.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Immediate message. H.J. 771.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Passed House, yeas 97, nays 0. H.J. 767.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Amendment H-1171 adopted. H.J. 767.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 746.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Amendment H-1171 filed. H.J. 750.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 539.
|
|
|