House | 06/01/2023 | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1042. | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1038. | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | Fiscal note. | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1037. | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Message from Senate. H.J. 907. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Immediate message. S.J. 930. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 929. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Substituted for SF 541. S.J. 928. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Fiscal note. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Read first time, attached to SF 541. S.J. 776. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Message from House. S.J. 776. | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Immediate message. H.J. 824. | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Passed House, yeas 99, nays 0. H.J. 823. | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Amendment H-1212 filed, adopted. H.J. 823. | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Fiscal note. | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 676. |