House
|
05/26/2023
|
Signed by Governor. H.J. 1042.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1038.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 1037.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 1028.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Immediate message. S.J. 1074.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 1073.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 1063.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Subcommittee Meeting: 04/25/2023 8:00AM Room 217 Conference Room.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Subcommittee: Cournoyer, Brown, and Winckler. S.J. 842.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 772.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Message from House. S.J. 772.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Immediate message. H.J. 805.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Passed House, yeas 98, nays 0. H.J. 793.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Fiscal note.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 677.
|
|
|