House | 05/11/2023 | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1043. | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1038. | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1037. | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Message from Senate. H.J. 915. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Immediate message. S.J. 982. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 977. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Substituted for SF 566. S.J. 976. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Read first time, attached to SF 566. S.J. 772. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Message from House. S.J. 772. | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Immediate message. H.J. 805. | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Passed House, yeas 93, nays 4. H.J. 789. | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 678. |