LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Iowa IA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HF7
Action History
IA
Iowa House Bill HF7
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Iowa 2023-2024 Regular Session
Iowa House Bill HF7
Action History
House
02/01/2023
Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 182.
House
01/31/2023
Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 230.
House
01/25/2023
Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1.
House
01/24/2023
Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2023 12:30PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber.
House
01/12/2023
Subcommittee: Wheeler, Kurth and Moore, T. H.J. 95.
House
01/11/2023
Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 58.