House
|
06/01/2023
|
Signed by Governor. H.J. 1042.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
NOBA: Final
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1038.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Explanations of votes. H.J. 1014.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Message from House. S.J. 1007.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 978.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Immediate message. H.J. 950.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Passed House, yeas 94, nays 0. H.J. 925.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
House concurred in Senate amendment H-1312. H.J. 925.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
NOBA: Senate Floor
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Senate amendment H-1312 filed. H.J. 913.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 910.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Immediate message. S.J. 961.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 960.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Amendment S-3176 adopted. S.J. 960.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
NOBA: Senate Full Approps
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Amendment S-3176 filed. S.J. 943.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 943.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
NOBA: Senate Sub
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Subcommittee Meeting: [].
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Subcommittee: Kraayenbrink, Petersen, and Zumbach. S.J. 843.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations. S.J. 844.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Read first time, passed on file. S.J. 780.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Message from House. S.J. 780.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
NOBA: House Floor
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Immediate message. H.J. 860.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Passed House, yeas 99, nays 0. H.J. 850.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Amendment H-1241 adopted. H.J. 850.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
NOBA: House Full Approps
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Amendment H-1241 filed. H.J. 827.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 783.
|
|
|