House
|
06/01/2023
|
Signed by Governor. H.J. 1042.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
NOBA: Final
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1038.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Message from House. S.J. 1068.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Immediate message. H.J. 1013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Passed House, yeas 93, nays 0. H.J. 990.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
House concurred in Senate amendment H-1344. H.J. 989.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Senate amendment H-1344 filed. H.J. 980.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 956.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Immediate message. S.J. 1013.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 1013.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Amendment S-3192 adopted. S.J. 1013.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
NOBA: Senate Full Approps
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Amendment S-3192 filed. S.J. 986.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 986.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Subcommittee Meeting: 04/24/2023 1:30PM Senate Lounge.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Subcommittee: Zumbach, Dotzler, and Kraayenbrink. S.J. 894.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations. S.J. 844.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Read first time, passed on file. S.J. 780.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Message from House. S.J. 780.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
NOBA: House Floor
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Immediate message. H.J. 860.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Passed House, yeas 99, nays 0. H.J. 848.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
NOBA: House Full Approps
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 784.
|
|
|