House
|
06/01/2023
|
Signed by Governor. H.J. 1042.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1038.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 1028.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Immediate message. S.J. 1071.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed Senate, yeas 33, nays 16. S.J. 1071.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 1064.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Explanations of votes. H.J. 1014.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Subcommittee Meeting: 05/03/2023 8:30AM Senate Lounge.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Subcommittee: Schultz, Cournoyer, and Quirmbach. S.J. 1032.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 1008.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Message from House. S.J. 1008.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Immediate message. H.J. 950.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Passed House, yeas 61, nays 33. H.J. 949.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Amendment H-1325 filed, adopted. H.J. 949.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Amendment H-1260 adopted. H.J. 949.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Amendment H-1260 filed. H.J. 887.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 860.
|
|
|