Iowa 2023-2024 Regular Session

Iowa House Bill HF98 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/24/2023

                            House File 98 - Introduced   HOUSE FILE 98   BY MOORE   A BILL FOR   An Act extending the period of budget years for which 1   supplementary weighting is available for shared operational 2   functions by school districts and area education agencies. 3   BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF IOWA: 4   TLSB 1754YH (1) 90   md/jh  

  H.F. 98   Section 1. Section 257.11, subsection 5, Code 2023, is 1   amended to read as follows: 2   5. Shared operational functions  increased student 3   opportunities  budget years beginning in 2014 through 2024   4   2034   . 5   a. (1) In order to provide additional funding to increase 6   student opportunities and redirect more resources to student 7   programming for school districts that share operational 8   functions, a district that shares with a political subdivision 9   one or more operational functions of a curriculum director, 10   master social worker, independent social worker, work-based 11   learning coordinator, special education director, mental health 12   professional who holds a statement of recognition issued by the 13   board of educational examiners, college and career transition 14   counselor or coordinator, school resource officer, or school 15   counselor, or one or more operational functions in the areas 16   of superintendent management, business management, human 17   resources, transportation, or operation and maintenance for at 18   least twenty percent of the school year shall be assigned a 19   supplementary weighting for each shared operational function. 20   A school district that shares an operational function in 21   the area of superintendent management shall be assigned a 22   supplementary weighting of nine pupils for the function. A 23   school district that shares an operational function in the area 24   of business management, human resources, transportation, or 25   operation and maintenance shall be assigned a supplementary 26   weighting of five pupils for the function. A school district 27   that shares the operational functions of a curriculum director; 28   a master social worker or an independent social worker licensed 29   under chapters 147 and 154C ; a work-based learning coordinator; 30   a special education director; a mental health professional 31   who holds a statement of recognition issued by the board 32   of educational examiners; a college and career transition 33   counselor or coordinator; a school resource officer; or a   34   school counselor shall be assigned a supplementary weighting of 35   -1-   LSB 1754YH (1) 90   md/jh   1/ 4    

  H.F. 98   three pupils for the function. The additional weighting shall 1   be assigned for each discrete operational function shared. 2   However, a school district may receive the additional weighting 3   under this subsection for sharing the services of an individual 4   with a political subdivision or another school district even if 5   the type of operational function performed by the individual 6   for the school district and the type of operational function 7   performed by the individual for the political subdivision or 8   another school district are not the same operational function, 9   so long as either both operational functions are eligible for 10   weighting under this subsection or the operational function 11   the individual performs for the school district is special 12   education director. In either case, the school district 13   shall be assigned the additional weighting for the type of 14   operational function that the individual performs for the 15   school district, and the school district shall not receive 16   additional weighting for any other function performed by the 17   individual. The operational function sharing arrangement does 18   not need to be a newly implemented sharing arrangement to 19   receive supplementary weighting under this subsection . 20   (2) For the purposes of this paragraph a : 21   (a) College and career transition counselor or coordinator 22   means a licensed school counselor or an appropriately trained 23   individual responsible for providing direct services to 24   students, parents, families, schools, and postsecondary 25   institutions to support college preparation and postsecondary 26   success, such as college preparation, financial aid processing, 27   and transition to postsecondary institution enrollment. 28   (b) Political subdivision means a city, township, county, 29   school corporation, merged area, area education agency, 30   institution governed by the state board of regents, or any 31   other governmental subdivision. 32   (c) School resource officer means the same as defined in 33   34 U.S.C. 10389.   34   (d) Work-based learning coordinator means an appropriately 35   -2-   LSB 1754YH (1) 90   md/jh   2/ 4  

  H.F. 98   trained individual responsible for facilitating authentic, 1   engaging work-based learning experiences for learners and 2   educators in partnership with employers and others to enhance 3   learning by connecting the content and skills that are 4   necessary for future careers. 5   b. (1) Notwithstanding paragraph a , subparagraph (1), 6   each operational function assigned a supplementary weighting 7   of five pupils under paragraph a , subparagraph (1), shall 8   instead be assigned a supplementary weighting of four pupils 9   for the school budget years beginning on or after   July 1, 2022, 10   July 1, 2023, and July 1, 2024   but before July 1, 2035 . 11   (2) Notwithstanding paragraph a , subparagraph (1), each 12   operational function assigned a supplementary weighting of 13   three pupils under paragraph a , subparagraph (1), shall 14   instead be assigned a supplementary weighting of two pupils for 15   the school budget years beginning on or after   July 1, 2022, 16   July 1, 2023, and July 1, 2024 but before July 1, 2035 . 17   c. School districts that share operational functions with 18   other school districts are not required to be contiguous school 19   districts. If two or more districts sharing operational 20   functions are not contiguous to each other, the districts 21   separating those districts are not required to be a party to 22   the operational functions sharing arrangement. 23   d. Supplementary weighting pursuant to this subsection shall 24   be available to a school district during the period commencing 25   with the budget year beginning July 1, 2014, through the 26   budget year beginning July 1, 2024   2034 . The maximum amount 27   of additional weighting for which a school district shall be 28   eligible in a budget year is twenty-one additional pupils. 29   Criteria for determining the qualification of operational 30   functions for supplementary weighting shall be determined by 31   the department by rule, through consideration of increased 32   student opportunities. 33   e. Supplementary weighting pursuant to this subsection shall 34   be available to an area education agency during the period 35   -3-   LSB 1754YH (1) 90   md/jh   3/ 4          

  H.F. 98   commencing with the budget year beginning July 1, 2014, through 1   the budget year beginning July 1, 2024   2034 . The minimum 2   amount of additional funding for which an area education 3   agency shall be eligible in a budget year is thirty thousand 4   dollars, and the maximum amount of additional funding for which 5   an area education agency shall be eligible is two hundred 6   thousand dollars. The department of management shall annually 7   set a weighting for each area education agency to generate 8   the approved operational sharing expense using the area 9   education agencys special education cost per pupil amount and 10   foundation level. Criteria for determining the qualification 11   of operational functions for supplementary weighting shall be 12   determined by the department by rule, through consideration of 13   increased student opportunities. 14   f. This subsection is repealed effective July 1, 2025   2035 . 15   EXPLANATION 16   The inclusion of this explanation does not constitute agreement with 17   the explanations substance by the members of the general assembly. 18   Code section 257.11(5) provides supplementary weighting 19   for school districts and area education agencies that share 20   specified operational functions with another political 21   subdivision of this state. Supplementary weighting under 22   this provision is available for school budget years beginning 23   on or after July 1, 2014, through the budget year beginning 24   July 1, 2024. This bill extends the period of years for the 25   supplementary weighting through the budget year beginning July 26   1, 2034.   27   -4-   LSB 1754YH (1) 90   md/jh   4/ 4