House | 03/02/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 595. | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 471. | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 2-0. | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/15/2023 8:15AM House Lounge. | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/09/2023 8:15AM RM 19 (Cancelled). | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | Subcommittee: Thompson, P., Lohse and Wilburn. H.J. 201. | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 199. | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |