House | 02/22/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 424. | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 385. | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/07/2023 12:00PM RM 19. | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | Subcommittee: Boden, Best and Turek. H.J. 208. | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | Introduced, referred to Health and Human Services. H.J. 206. | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | By COMMITTEE ON HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |