House | 02/20/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 346. | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 360. | ||
House | 01/23/2023 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. | ||
House | 01/18/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2023 12:00PM RM 304.1. | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | Subcommittee: Sorensen, Kniff McCulla and Scholten. H.J. 96. | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | Introduced, referred to Economic Growth and Technology. H.J. 92. | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | By COMMITTEE ON ECONOMIC GROWTH AND TECHNOLOGY |