House | 03/13/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 665. | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 598. | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2023 11:30AM House Lounge. | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Subcommittee: Johnson, Best and Gjerde. H.J. 229. | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 227. | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |