House | 03/13/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 662. | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 499. | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: []. | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/20/2023 12:00PM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Subcommittee: Bloomingdale, Baeth, Johnson, Lundgren, Nielsen, Young and Zabner. H.J. 229. | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 227. | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |