House | 02/24/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 431. | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 384. | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/14/2023 2:45PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Subcommittee: Lundgren, Judge and Mohr, G. H.J. 229. | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Introduced, referred to Commerce. H.J. 228. | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |