House | 01/26/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 143. | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 189. | ||
House | 01/18/2023 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/18/2023 3:00PM House Lounge. | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | Subcommittee: Wood, Gaines and Latham. H.J. 96. | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | Introduced, referred to Economic Growth and Technology. H.J. 92. | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | By COMMITTEE ON ECONOMIC GROWTH AND TECHNOLOGY |