House | 03/07/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 642. | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 496. | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/22/2023 8:00AM House Lounge. | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/16/2023 7:45AM House Lounge 2 (Cancelled). | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Subcommittee: Moore, T., Gerhold and Staed. H.J. 262. | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Introduced, referred to Economic Growth and Technology. H.J. 259. | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | By COMMITTEE ON ECONOMIC GROWTH AND TECHNOLOGY |