House | 03/02/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 550. | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 471. | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1. | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/22/2023 12:15PM House Lounge 2. | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Subcommittee: Thompson, P., Nordman and Srinivas. H.J. 262. | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 260. | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |