House | 03/02/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 554. | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 446. | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0. | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2023 8:00AM RM 304.1. | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/16/2023 12:30PM House Lounge (Cancelled). | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Subcommittee: Wood, Meggers and Wilson. H.J. 294. | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Introduced, referred to Economic Growth and Technology. H.J. 294. | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | By COMMITTEE ON ECONOMIC GROWTH AND TECHNOLOGY |