House | 03/02/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 580. | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 446. | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0. | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/15/2023 8:00AM House Lounge. | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Subcommittee: Mommsen, Carlson and Kurth. H.J. 294. | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Introduced, referred to Agriculture. H.J. 294. | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | By COMMITTEE ON AGRICULTURE |