House | 03/02/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 567. | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 471. | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1. | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/21/2023 12:00PM House Lounge. | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Subcommittee: Nordman, Gustafson and Srinivas. H.J. 308. | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 307. | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |