House | 03/02/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 579. | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 448. | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0. | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/22/2023 8:00AM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Subcommittee: Thompson, P., Dieken and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 359. | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 357. | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | By COMMITTEE ON PUBLIC SAFETY |