House | 02/27/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 459. | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 419. | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/22/2023 7:45AM House Lounge. | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Subcommittee: Ingels, Kurth and Stone. H.J. 359. | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 357. | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | By COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION |