Iowa 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Iowa House Bill HSB169 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/15/2023

                    House Study Bill 169 - Introduced   HOUSE FILE _____   BY (PROPOSED COMMITTEE   ON EDUCATION BILL BY   CHAIRPERSON WHEELER)   A BILL FOR   An Act relating to supplementary weighting for certain shared 1   operational functions and including effective date and 2   applicability provisions. 3   BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF IOWA: 4   TLSB 2269YC (1) 90   md/jh  

  H.F. _____   Section 1. Section 257.11, subsection 5, paragraph b, 1   as amended by 2023 Iowa Acts, House File 68, section 15, is 2   amended to read as follows: 3   b. (1) Notwithstanding paragraph a , subparagraph (1), 4   each operational function assigned a supplementary weighting 5   of five pupils under paragraph a , subparagraph (1), shall 6   instead be assigned a supplementary weighting of four pupils 7   for the school budget years   year beginning on or after July 1, 8   2022 , but before July 1, 2035   . 9   (2) Notwithstanding paragraph a , subparagraph (1), each 10   operational function assigned a supplementary weighting of 11   three pupils under paragraph a , subparagraph (1), shall 12   instead be assigned a supplementary weighting of two pupils 13   for the school budget years   year beginning on or after July 1, 14   2022 , but before July 1, 2035 . 15   Sec. 2. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act, being deemed of immediate 16   importance, takes effect upon enactment. 17   Sec. 3. APPLICABILITY. This Act applies July 1, 2023, for 18   school budget years beginning on or after that date, subject 19   to the school budget year limitations of section 257.11, 20   subsection 5. 21   EXPLANATION 22   The inclusion of this explanation does not constitute agreement with 23   the explanations substance by the members of the general assembly. 24   Code section 257.11(5) establishes a list of eligible 25   operational functions and positions eligible for a 26   supplementary weighting for school districts and area education 27   agencies. Legislation in 2021 established a reduction in the 28   number of pupils assigned for certain functions and positions 29   and 2023 Iowa Acts, House File 68, extended the program until 30   the end of the school budget year beginning July 1, 2034. For 31   school budget years beginning on or after July 1, 2022, until 32   the end of the school budget year beginning July 1, 2034, each 33   operational function assigned a supplementary weighting of five 34   pupils is assigned four pupils and each operational function 35   -1-   LSB 2269YC (1) 90   md/jh   1/ 2          

  H.F. _____   assigned a supplementary weighting of three pupils will be 1   assigned two pupils. 2   This bill removes the reduction in the number of pupils 3   assigned for school budget years beginning on or after July 1, 4   2023, until the end of the program. 5   The bill takes effect upon enactment. 6   -2-   LSB 2269YC (1) 90   md/jh   2/ 2