House | 03/07/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 654. | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 489. | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1. | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/21/2023 12:00PM RM 19. | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Subcommittee: Holt, Meyer, B. and Thompson, P. H.J. 364. | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 364. | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | By COMMITTEE ON PUBLIC SAFETY |