House | 02/27/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 475. | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 419. | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0. | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/22/2023 11:45AM House Lounge. | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Subcommittee: Nordman, Judge and Thompson, P. H.J. 374. | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Introduced, referred to Commerce. H.J. 373. | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |