House | 03/07/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 655. | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 497. | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/28/2023 2:30PM House Lounge. | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | Subcommittee: Gustoff, Lohse and Scheetz. H.J. 426. | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 426. | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |