House | 01/26/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF141. | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 191. | ||
House | 01/18/2023 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/18/2023 12:00PM House Lounge 2. | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | Subcommittee: Gustafson, Isenhart and Rinker. H.J. 97. | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | Introduced, referred to Veterans Affairs. H.J. 94. | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | By COMMITTEE ON VETERANS AFFAIRS |