House | 04/24/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 719. | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 887. | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/11/2023 12:00PM House Lounge. | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Subcommittee: Jones, Best and Kurth. H.J. 747. | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 746. | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |