House | 05/03/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 727. | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | NOBA: House Sub | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 1016. | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0. | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 05/02/2023 8:30AM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. | ||
House | 04/30/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 05/01/2023 9:00AM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber (Cancelled). | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Subcommittee: Lohse, Mohr, G. and Wilburn. H.J. 954. | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Introduced, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 953. | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | By COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS |