House | 02/16/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 335. | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 361. | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/09/2023 12:15PM House Lounge 2. | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Subcommittee reassigned: Wulf, Dunwell and Madison. H.J. 248. | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Subcommittee reassigned: Best, Madison and Wulf. H.J. 228. | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2023 4:30PM House Lounge (Cancelled). | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | Subcommittee: Sieck, Madison and Wulf. H.J. 97. | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | Introduced, referred to Transportation. H.J. 94. | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | By COMMITTEE ON TRANSPORTATION |