House | 02/05/2024 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2315. | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 174. | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/24/2024 8:15AM House Lounge. | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Subcommittee: Meggers, Abdul-Samad and Dieken. H.J. 51. | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 47. | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | By COMMITTEE ON PUBLIC SAFETY |