House | 02/19/2024 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2616. | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 282. | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1. | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/12/2024 1:00PM RM 304. | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Tabled until future meeting. Vote Total: 2-0. | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Subcommittee: Collins, Meyer, B. and Wheeler. H.J. 51. | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 47. | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |