House | 02/05/2024 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2318. | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 185. | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/24/2024 3:00PM House Lounge. | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Subcommittee reassigned: Kaufmann, Olson and Wills, J. H.J. 123. | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Subcommittee reassigned: Kaufmann, Wilburn and Wills, J. H.J. 88. | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Olson and Wills, J. H.J. 51. | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 47. | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |