House | 02/01/2024 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2279. | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 172. | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2024 2:45PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Subcommittee: Wilz, H., Bagniewski and Lohse. H.J. 88. | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Introduced, referred to Commerce. H.J. 87. | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |