House | 02/01/2024 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2270. | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 173. | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0. | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2024 12:30PM RM 304. | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Subcommittee: Boden, Cahill and Gustoff. H.J. 104. | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 101. | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | By COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION |