House | 02/13/2024 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2487. | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 248. | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0. | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/24/2024 12:00PM RM 304. | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Subcommittee: Boden, Gustoff and Steckman. H.J. 104. | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 101. | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | By COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION |