House | 02/09/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 251. | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 278. | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 2-1. | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2023 8:00AM RM 19. | ||
House | 01/20/2023 | Subcommittee: Fry, Sorensen and Steckman. H.J. 132. | ||
House | 01/20/2023 | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 130. | ||
House | 01/20/2023 | By COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION |