House | 02/05/2024 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2326. | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 175. | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/30/2024 12:00PM RM 19. | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Subcommittee: Young, Harris and Nielsen. H.J. 117. | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 117. | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |